The Lord John E. TOMLINSON
Constituencies
Show earlier Constituencies...
- Labour Party United Kingdom 1994/07/19 - 1999/07/19
- Labour Party United Kingdom 1989/07/25 - 1994/07/18
- Labour Party United Kingdom 1984/07/24 - 1989/07/24
Groups
Show earlier Groups...
- SOC Member Socialist Group 1984/07/24 - 1989/07/24
- SOC Member of the Bureau Socialist Group 1989/07/25 - 1993/04/20
- PSE Member of the Bureau Group of the Party of European Socialists 1993/04/21 - 1993/07/13
- PSE Member Group of the Party of European Socialists 1993/07/14 - 1994/07/18
- PSE Member Group of the Party of European Socialists 1994/07/19 - 1999/07/19
Committees
Show earlier committees...
Role | Committee | Start | End |
---|---|---|---|
Substitute of | Committee on Budgetary Control | 1984/07/26 | 1987/01/20 |
Member of | Committee on Budgets | 1984/07/26 | 1987/01/20 |
Substitute of | Committee on Development and Cooperation | 1984/07/26 | 1987/01/20 |
Substitute of | Committee on Budgetary Control | 1987/01/21 | 1989/07/24 |
Member of | Committee on Budgets | 1987/01/21 | 1989/07/24 |
Member of | Committee on Budgetary Control | 1988/02/08 | 1989/07/24 |
Member of | Committee on Budgetary Control | 1989/07/26 | 1992/01/14 |
Member of | Committee on Budgets | 1989/07/26 | 1992/01/14 |
Substitute of | Committee on External Economic Relations | 1989/07/26 | 1992/01/14 |
Member of | Committee on Budgetary Control | 1992/01/15 | 1994/07/18 |
Member of | Committee on Budgets | 1992/01/15 | 1994/07/18 |
Substitute of | Committee on Legal Affairs and Citizens' Rights | 1992/01/15 | 1994/07/18 |
Substitute of | Committee on Budgetary Control | 1994/07/21 | 1994/09/28 |
Member of | Committee on Budgets | 1994/07/21 | 1997/01/15 |
Substitute of | Committee on Development and Cooperation | 1994/07/21 | 1997/01/15 |
Member of | Committee on Budgetary Control | 1994/09/29 | 1997/01/15 |
Member of | Temporary committee of Inquiry into the Community Transit System | 1995/12/14 | 1996/01/15 |
Chair of | Temporary committee of Inquiry into the Community Transit System | 1996/01/16 | 1996/07/17 |
Chair of | Temporary committee of inquiry into the Community Transit System | 1996/07/18 | 1997/03/13 |
Vice-Chair of | Committee on Budgetary Control | 1997/01/16 | 1999/07/19 |
Member of | Committee on Budgets | 1997/01/16 | 1999/07/19 |
Substitute of | Committee on External Economic Relations | 1997/01/16 | 1999/07/19 |
Delegations
Show earlier delegations...
Role | Delegation | Start | End |
---|---|---|---|
Chair of | Delegation for relations with the Northern European Countries and the Nordic Council | 1985/02/12 | 1986/03/09 |
Chair of | Delegation for relations with the Northern European Countries and the Nordic Council | 1986/03/10 | 1987/01/20 |
Vice-Chair of | Delegation for relations with Norway | 1987/01/21 | 1989/07/24 |
Member of | Delegation for relations with the countries of South Asia and the South Asian Association for Regional Cooperation (SAARC) | 1989/07/26 | 1992/01/14 |
Member of | Delegation for relations with Norway | 1992/01/15 | 1992/02/14 |
Member of | Delegation for relations with Sweden | 1992/01/15 | 1993/02/10 |
Substitute of | Delegation for relations with the countries of South Asia and the South Asian Association for Regional Cooperation (SAARC) | 1992/01/15 | 1993/02/10 |
Substitute of | Delegation for relations with the countries of South Asia and the South Asian Association for Regional Cooperation (SAARC) | 1993/02/11 | 1994/01/31 |
Member of | Delegation to the EC-Sweden Joint Parliamentary Committee | 1993/02/11 | 1994/01/31 |
Substitute of | Delegation for relations with the countries of South Asia and the South Asian Association for Regional Cooperation (SAARC) | 1994/02/01 | 1994/07/18 |
Member of | Delegation to the EU-Sweden Joint Parliamentary Committee | 1994/02/01 | 1994/07/18 |
Member of | Delegation for relations with the countries of South Asia and the South Asia Association for Regional Cooperation (SAARC) | 1994/11/17 | 1995/07/11 |
Member of | Delegation for relations with the countries of South Asia and the South Asia Association for Regional Cooperation (SAARC) | 1995/07/12 | 1997/01/15 |
Member of | Delegation for relations with Latvia | 1997/01/16 | 1997/10/13 |
Member of | Delegation to the EU-Latvia Joint Parliamentary Committee | 1997/10/14 | 1999/07/19 |
Rapporteur
Type | Dossier | Committee | Title |
---|---|---|---|
Committee Opinion | 1998/2027(COS) | CONT Budgetary Control | Middle East: role of the European Union in the peace process and its future assistance |
Responsible Committee | 1998/2009(BUD) | BUDG Budgets | Supplementary and amending budget 1/1998 |
Responsible Committee | 1998/0220(SYN) | BUDG Budgets | West Bank and Gaza Strip: financial and technical cooperation (amend. Regulation (EC) No 1734/94) |
Former Responsible Committee | 1998/0220(SYN) | BUDG Budgets | West Bank and Gaza Strip: financial and technical cooperation (amend. Regulation (EC) No 1734/94) |
Responsible Committee | 1998/0175(CNS) | BUDG Budgets | European Investment Bank (EIB) loans for projects in Bosnia and Herzegovina: Community guarantee to the EIB |
Responsible Committee | 1998/0117(CNS) | BUDG Budgets | Guarantee Fund for external actions: target amount |
Former Responsible Committee | 1998/0117(CNS) | BUDG Budgets | Guarantee Fund for external actions: target amount |
Responsible Committee | 1998/0006(CNS) | BUDG Budgets | European Investment Bank (EIB) loans to the former Yugoslav Republic of Macedonia FYROM: Community guarantee to the EIB against losses |
Committee Opinion | 1997/2237(COS) | CONT Budgetary Control | Amsterdam draft treaty |
Responsible Committee | 1997/2209(BUD) | BUDG Budgets | Budget 1998: other sections |
Former Responsible Committee | 1997/2209(BUD) | BUDG Budgets | Budget 1998: other sections |
Responsible Committee | 1997/2208(BUD) | BUDG Budgets | Budget 1998: section III |
Former Responsible Committee | 1997/2208(BUD) | BUDG Budgets | Budget 1998: section III |
Responsible Committee | 1997/2002(BUD) | BUDG Budgets | 1998 budget: EP estimates |
Responsible Committee | 1996/0278(CNS) | BUDG Budgets | EIB loans for Europe, Asia and Latin America countries: EC guarantee to the EIB against losses |
Responsible Committee | 1996/0015(CNS) | BUDG Budgets | EIB loans for Latin America and Asia countries: Community guarantee to the EIB against losses |
Responsible Committee | 1995/2315(COS) | BUDG Budgets | EC general budget: guarantees, situation at 30 June 1995. Report |
Former Committee Opinion | 1995/0160(SYN) | BUDG Budgets | Food aid policy: management of EC food aid and special operations in support of food security in developing countries |
Committee Opinion | 1995/0111(SYN) | BUDG Budgets | Southern Africa/EC relations: support for rehabilitation programmes |
Former Committee Opinion | 1995/0110(SYN) | BUDG Budgets | EC/South Africa relations: financial, technical and economic cooperation |
Committee Opinion | 1994/2139(INI) | DEVE Development | Incorporation of the EDF in the EC budget |
Responsible Committee | 1994/0276(CNS) | BUDG Budgets | EIB loans for South Africa: Community guarantee to the European Investment Bank EIB against losses |
Former Responsible Committee | 1994/0276(CNS) | BUDG Budgets | EIB loans for South Africa: Community guarantee to the European Investment Bank EIB against losses |
Responsible Committee | 1994/0015(CNS) | CONT Budgetary Control | EAGGF Guarantee section: measures in respect of certains beneficiaries of operations financed by the fund |
Activities
Stats
Amendment Co-authors
Name | Group | Country | Ams |
---|
By types
Reports (15)By dossiers
Count | Dossier Reference | Title |
3 | 1997/0316(SYN) | West Bank and Gaza Strip: financial and technical cooperation (amend. Regulation (EC) No 1734/94) |
2 | 1998/0117(CNS) | Guarantee Fund for external actions: target amount |
2 | 1998/0220(SYN) | West Bank and Gaza Strip: financial and technical cooperation (amend. Regulation (EC) No 1734/94) |
2 | 1997/2209(BUD) | Budget 1998: other sections |
2 | 1997/2208(BUD) | Budget 1998: section III |
1 | 1998/2009(BUD) | Supplementary and amending budget 1/1998 |
1 | 1998/0175(CNS) | European Investment Bank (EIB) loans for projects in Bosnia and Herzegovina: Community guarantee to the EIB |
1 | 1998/0006(CNS) | European Investment Bank (EIB) loans to the former Yugoslav Republic of Macedonia FYROM: Community guarantee to the EIB against losses |
1 | 1997/2002(BUD) | 1998 budget: EP estimates |
1 | 1996/0278(CNS) | EIB loans for Europe, Asia and Latin America countries: EC guarantee to the EIB against losses |
1 | 1995/2315(COS) | EC general budget: guarantees, situation at 30 June 1995. Report |
1 | 1996/0015(CNS) | EIB loans for Latin America and Asia countries: Community guarantee to the EIB against losses |
See historical changes of the Bio
Born
1939/08/01 - London- MA in Industrial Relations (University of Warwick).
The Lord John E. TOMLINSON on
History
(these mark the time of scraping, not the official date of the change)
2013-07-21Show (1) Changes
CV |
|