Daniel COHN-BENDIT
Constituencies
Show earlier Constituencies...
- Europe Écologie France 2009/07/14 - 2014/06/30
- Bündnis 90/Die Grünen Germany 2004/07/20 - 2009/07/13
- Les Verts-Europe-Ecologie France 1999/07/20 - 2004/07/19
- Bündnis 90/die Grünen Germany 1994/07/19 - 1999/07/19
Groups
Show earlier Groups...
- Verts/ALE Member The Green Group in the European Parliament 1994/07/19 - 1999/07/19
- Verts/ALE Member Group of the Greens/European Free Alliance 1999/07/20 - 2002/01/07
- Verts/ALE Co-Chair Group of the Greens/European Free Alliance 2002/01/08 - 2004/07/19
- Verts/ALE Co-Chair Group of the Greens/European Free Alliance 2004/07/20 - 2005/05/23
- Verts/ALE Co-Chair Group of the Greens/European Free Alliance 2005/05/24 - 2007/07/19
- Verts/ALE Co-Chair Group of the Greens/European Free Alliance 2007/07/20 - 2009/07/13
- Verts/ALE Co-Chair Group of the Greens/European Free Alliance 2009/07/14 - 2014/06/30
EP staff
Show earlier staff roles...
- Member of Conference of Delegation Chairs 1999/07/22 - 2002/01/14
- Member of Conference of Presidents 2002/01/08 - 2004/07/19
- Member of Conference of Presidents 2004/07/20 - 2006/12/12
- Member of Conference of Presidents 2006/12/13 - 2009/07/13
- Member of Conference of Presidents 2009/07/14 - 2014/06/30
Committees
Show earlier committees...
Role | Committee | Start | End |
---|---|---|---|
Member of | Committee on Culture, Youth, Education and the Media | 1994/07/21 | 1994/07/22 |
Substitute of | Committee on Civil Liberties and Internal Affairs | 1994/07/21 | 1997/01/15 |
Vice-Chair of | Committee on Culture, Youth, Education and the Media | 1994/07/22 | 1995/11/16 |
Member of | Committee on Foreign Affairs, Security and Defence Policy | 1995/10/27 | 1997/01/15 |
Substitute of | Committee on Legal Affairs and Citizens' Rights | 1997/01/16 | 1997/01/21 |
Substitute of | Committee on Civil Liberties and Internal Affairs | 1997/01/16 | 1998/11/19 |
Member of | Committee on Foreign Affairs, Security and Defence Policy | 1997/01/16 | 1999/07/19 |
Substitute of | Committee on Culture, Youth, Education and the Media | 1998/11/19 | 1999/07/19 |
Member of | Committee on Foreign Affairs, Human Rights, Common Security and Defence Policy | 1999/07/21 | 2002/01/14 |
Substitute of | Committee on Budgets | 1999/07/22 | 2002/01/14 |
Member of | Committee on Regional Policy, Transport and Tourism | 2002/01/17 | 2002/09/01 |
Substitute of | Committee on Constitutional Affairs | 2002/01/17 | 2004/07/19 |
Substitute of | Committee on Foreign Affairs, Human Rights, Common Security and Defence Policy | 2002/01/17 | 2004/07/19 |
Member of | Committee on Culture, Youth, Education, the Media and Sport | 2002/09/02 | 2004/07/19 |
Substitute of | Committee on Foreign Affairs | 2004/07/21 | 2004/07/27 |
Member of | Committee on Constitutional Affairs | 2004/07/21 | 2007/01/14 |
Member of | Committee on Economic and Monetary Affairs | 2004/07/21 | 2007/01/14 |
Substitute of | Subcommittee on Security and Defence | 2004/07/21 | 2007/01/14 |
Member of | Committee on Constitutional Affairs | 2007/01/15 | 2007/01/30 |
Member of | Committee on Economic and Monetary Affairs | 2007/01/15 | 2007/01/30 |
Substitute of | Subcommittee on Security and Defence | 2007/01/15 | 2007/01/30 |
Substitute of | Committee on Budgets | 2007/01/31 | 2009/07/13 |
Member of | Committee on Constitutional Affairs | 2007/01/31 | 2009/07/13 |
Substitute of | Subcommittee on Security and Defence | 2007/01/31 | 2009/07/13 |
Member of | Committee on Budgets | 2009/07/16 | 2012/01/18 |
Substitute of | Committee on Foreign Affairs | 2012/01/19 | 2014/06/30 |
Delegations
Show earlier delegations...
Role | Delegation | Start | End |
---|---|---|---|
Member of | Delegation for relations with the Maghreb countries and the Arab Maghreb Union | 1995/01/18 | 1995/07/11 |
Member of | Delegation for relations with the Maghreb countries and the Arab Maghreb Union | 1995/07/12 | 1997/01/15 |
Member of | Delegation for relations with the Maghreb countries and the Arab Maghreb Union | 1997/01/16 | 1997/10/13 |
Member of | Delegation for relations with the Maghreb countries and the Arab Maghreb Union | 1997/10/14 | 1999/02/23 |
Member of | Delegation for relations with the Maghreb countries and the Arab Maghreb Union | 1999/02/24 | 1999/07/19 |
Chair of | Delegation to the EU-Turkey Joint Parliamentary Committee | 1999/07/22 | 2002/01/14 |
Member of | Delegation for relations with the NATO Parliamentary Assembly | 2002/02/07 | 2004/07/19 |
Substitute of | Delegation for relations with South Africa | 2004/09/15 | 2007/03/13 |
Substitute of | Delegation for relations with the NATO Parliamentary Assembly | 2004/09/15 | 2007/03/13 |
Member of | Delegation to the Euro-Mediterranean Parliamentary Assembly | 2004/09/15 | 2007/03/14 |
Substitute of | Delegation to the EU-Turkey Joint Parliamentary Committee | 2004/09/15 | 2009/07/13 |
Substitute of | Delegation for relations with South Africa | 2007/03/14 | 2009/07/13 |
Substitute of | Delegation for relations with the NATO Parliamentary Assembly | 2007/03/14 | 2009/07/13 |
Substitute of | Delegation to the Euro-Mediterranean Parliamentary Assembly | 2007/03/15 | 2009/07/13 |
Rapporteur
Type | Dossier | Committee | Title |
---|---|---|---|
Responsible Committee | 2001/2027(INI) | AFET Foreign Affairs | Relations between European Union and the Union of Arabic Maghreb: coming into force of a privileged partnership |
Responsible Committee | 1996/2076(COS) | AFET Foreign Affairs | Former Yugoslavia: prospects for developping regional cooperation |
Former Committee Opinion | 1994/0135(COD) | LIBE Civil Liberties, Justice and Home Affairs | Public health: Community action programme 1996-2000 on the prevention of drug dependence |
Activities
Stats
Amendment Co-authors
Name | Group | Country | Ams |
---|
By types
Plenary speeches (326)Reports (2)
Written declarations (9)
By dossiers
Count | Dossier Reference | Title |
2 | 2007/2554(RSP) | Resolution on the EU-Russia summit in Samara on 18 May 2007 |
2 | 2004/0001(COD) | Services in the internal market. Services Directive |
2 | 2011/0371(COD) | Erasmus+ programme for education, training, youth and sport 2014-2020 |
2 | 2013/2673(RSP) | Resolution on preparations for the European Council meeting (27-28 June 2013) - European action to combat youth unemployment |
2 | 2013/2528(RSP) | Decision on the opening of, and on the mandate for, interinstitutional negotiations on the proposal for a regulation establishing rules for direct payments to farmers under support schemes within the framework of the common agricultural policy |
2 | 2011/2546(RSP) | Resolution on the conclusions of the European Council meeting (8-9 December 2011) on a draft international agreement on a Fiscal Stability Union |
2 | 2011/2616(RSP) | Resolution on the Southern Neighbourhood, and Libya in particular |
2 | 2011/2517(RSP) | Resolution on the situation in Tunisia |
1 | 2008/2336(INI) | Annual report on human rights in the world 2008 and the European Union's policy on the matter |
1 | 2008/2169(INL) | Guidelines for a proposal of a regulation of the European Parliament and the Council on the implementation of the citizens' initiative, pursuant to Article 11(4) of the Treaty on the European Union |
1 | 1998/0304(CNS) | EC/Turkmenistan agreement: interim agreement on trade |
1 | 2008/2334(INI) | Report on a European Economic Recovery Plan |
1 | 2009/2504(RSP) | Resolution on the situation in the Gaza Strip |
1 | 2008/2650(RSP) | Resolution on the proposal for a Council framework decision on the use of passenger name record (PNR) for law enforcement purposes |
1 | 2008/2523(RSP) | Resolution on the European Council of 15-16 October 2008 |
1 | 2007/2253(INI) | Media concentration and pluralism in the EU |
1 | 2005/0281(COD) | Waste Framework Directive |
1 | 2008/2575(RSP) | Resolution on the tragic situation in Burma |
1 | 2007/2268(INI) | 2007 progress report on FYROM |
1 | 2006/0136(COD) | Placing of plant protection products on the market |
1 | 2007/2505(RSP) | Resolution on the human rights situation of the Dalits in India |
1 | 2006/2617(RSP) | Resolution on the situation in the Middle East |
1 | 2006/2525(RSP) | Resolution on the right to freedom of expression and respect for religious beliefs |
1 | 2005/2134(INI) | Annual report on Common foreign and security policy CFSP 2004 |
1 | 2013/0253(COD) | Single Resolution Mechanism and Single Resolution Fund: uniform rules and procedure for the resolution of credit institutions and certain investment firms |
1 | 2011/2152(ACI) | Interinstitutional Agreement on cooperation in budgetary matters and on sound financial management 2014-2020 |
1 | 2011/0138(COD) | Visas: third countries whose nationals are subject to or exempt from a visa requirement |
1 | 2013/2025(INI) | Annual tax report: how to free the EU potential for economic growth |
1 | 2012/2259(INI) | Current challenges and opportunities for renewable energy on the European internal energy market |
1 | 2011/0300(COD) | Trans-European energy infrastructure: guidelines |
1 | 2012/2145(INI) | Annual report on human rights and democracy in the world 2011 and the European Union's policy on the matter |
1 | 2009/0155(NLE) | EC/Israel Agreement: Conformity Assessment and Acceptance of Industrial Products (CAA). Protocol to the Euro-Mediterranean Agreement |
1 | 2012/2788(RSP) | Resolution on Syria |
1 | 2011/2828(RSP) | Resolution on the situation in Palestine |
1 | 2011/2811(RSP) | Resolution on the situation in Libya |
1 | 2010/2299(INI) | Development of the common security and defence policy following the entry into force of the Lisbon Treaty |
1 | 2009/2182(INI) | Financial, economic and social crisis: recommendations concerning the measures and initiatives to be taken. Mid-term report |
1 | 2010/2735(RSP) | Resolution on the Israeli military operation against the humanitarian flotilla and the Gaza blockade |
1 | 2009/2150(INI) | Effects of the global financial and economic crisis on developing countries and on development cooperation |
1 | 1996/2076(COS) | Former Yugoslavia: prospects for developping regional cooperation |
1 | 2001/2027(INI) | Relations between European Union and the Union of Arabic Maghreb: coming into force of a privileged partnership |
See historical changes of the Bio
Born
1945/04/04 - MontaubanDaniel COHN-BENDIT on
History
(these mark the time of scraping, not the official date of the change)
2019-03-21Show (1) Changes | Timetravel
CV |
|
2014-09-07Show (4) Changes | Timetravel
CV/0 |
Advanced school-leaving certificate, Odenwaldschule (1966). Studied sociology at the University of Nanterre. Spokesman and leader, Paris May Revolution (1968). Deported from France (1968). Childcare worker with the Kinderladen movement in Frankfurt; bookseller at the Karl-Marx bookshop (1969-1973). Editor-in-chief and publisher of Pflasterstrand magazine (1976). Honorary head of department, Office for Multicultural Affairs (Frankfurt/Main) (1989). Presenter of the Swiss television programme Literaturklub (since 1994).
|
CV/1 |
Various publications and films.
|
CV/2 |
Member of the European Parliament (since 1994). Delegation Chairman, EU - Turkey Joint Parliamentary Committee (1999-2002). Co-chairman of the Group of the Greens/European Free Alliance (since 2002).
|
CV/3 |
Honorary doctorate from the Catholic University of Tilburg, Netherlands (1997), Trombinoscope 'Political Discovery' award for special contributions in the field of politics (1998).
|
2012-01-21Show (1) Changes
CV |
|