Jack M.E. LANG
Constituencies
Show earlier Constituencies...
- Parti socialiste France 1994/07/19 - 1997/07/31
Groups
Show earlier Groups...
- PSE Member Group of the Party of European Socialists 1994/07/19 - 1997/07/31
Committees
Show earlier committees...
Role | Committee | Start | End |
---|---|---|---|
Substitute of | Committee on Culture, Youth, Education and the Media | 1994/07/21 | 1995/02/22 |
Member of | Committee on Foreign Affairs, Security and Defence Policy | 1994/07/21 | 1997/01/15 |
Member of | Subcommittee on Security and Disarmament | 1994/07/21 | 1997/01/15 |
Substitute of | Committee on Civil Liberties and Internal Affairs | 1995/02/23 | 1997/01/15 |
Substitute of | Committee on Civil Liberties and Internal Affairs | 1997/01/16 | 1997/07/17 |
Member of | Subcommittee on Security and Disarmament | 1997/01/16 | 1997/07/18 |
Member of | Committee on Foreign Affairs, Security and Defence Policy | 1997/01/16 | 1997/07/31 |
Delegations
Show earlier delegations...
Role | Delegation | Start | End |
---|---|---|---|
Member of | Delegation for relations with Japan | 1994/11/17 | 1994/11/30 |
Vice-Chair of | Delegation for relations with Japan | 1994/12/01 | 1995/07/11 |
Vice-Chair of | Delegation for relations with Japan | 1995/07/12 | 1997/01/15 |
Substitute of | Delegation for relations with Japan | 1997/01/16 | 1997/07/31 |
Activities
Stats
Amendment Co-authors
Name | Group | Country | Ams |
---|
By types
By dossiers
Count | Dossier Reference | Title |
See historical changes of the Bio
Born
1939/09/02 - Mirecourt (Vosges)Jack M.E. LANG on
History
(these mark the time of scraping, not the official date of the change)
2019-03-21Show (1) Changes | Timetravel
CV |
|
2014-09-07Show (1) Changes | Timetravel
CV/0 |
Doctor of law, graduate of the Institute of Political Studies (Paris). Graduate teaching qualification in public law.
|
2013-07-21Show (1) Changes
CV |
|