Antonio GONZÁLEZ TRIVIÑO
Constituencies
Show earlier Constituencies...
- Partido Socialista Obrero Español Spain 1994/07/19 - 1999/07/19
Groups
Show earlier Groups...
- PSE Member Group of the Party of European Socialists 1994/07/19 - 1996/07/09
- NA Member Non-attached 1996/07/10 - 1996/09/17
- ERA Member Group of the European Radical Alliance 1996/09/18 - 1999/07/19
Committees
Show earlier committees...
Role | Committee | Start | End |
---|---|---|---|
Substitute of | Committee on Transport and Tourism | 1994/07/21 | 1994/09/29 |
Member of | Committee on the Environment, Public Health and Consumer Protection | 1994/07/21 | 1994/09/29 |
Member of | Committee on Transport and Tourism | 1994/09/30 | 1997/01/15 |
Substitute of | Committee on the Environment, Public Health and Consumer Protection | 1994/10/25 | 1995/10/12 |
Substitute of | Committee on Social Affairs and Employment | 1995/10/12 | 1997/01/15 |
Member of | Temporary committee of Inquiry into the Community Transit System | 1995/12/14 | 1996/07/17 |
Member of | Temporary committee of inquiry into the Community Transit System | 1996/07/18 | 1997/03/13 |
Substitute of | Committee on Employment and Social Affairs | 1997/01/16 | 1999/07/19 |
Member of | Committee on Transport and Tourism | 1997/01/16 | 1999/07/19 |
Delegations
Show earlier delegations...
Role | Delegation | Start | End |
---|---|---|---|
Member of | Delegation to the EU-Malta Joint Parliamentary Committee | 1994/11/17 | 1995/07/11 |
Member of | Delegation to the EU-Malta Joint Parliamentary Committee | 1995/07/12 | 1997/01/15 |
Substitute of | Delegation for relations with the countries of South America and MERCOSUR | 1997/01/16 | 1997/10/13 |
Substitute of | Delegation for relations with the countries of South America and MERCOSUR | 1997/10/14 | 1999/02/23 |
Substitute of | Delegation for relations with the countries of South America and MERCOSUR | 1999/02/24 | 1999/07/19 |
Rapporteur
Type | Dossier | Committee | Title |
---|---|---|---|
Former Responsible Committee | 1998/0022(COD) | TRAN Transport and Tourism | Air transport: protection of passenger rights, denied boarding compensation system |
Responsible Committee | 1997/0039(SYN) | TRAN Transport and Tourism | Air transport safety: third countries aircraft using Community airports |
Former Responsible Committee | 1997/0039(SYN) | TRAN Transport and Tourism | Air transport safety: third countries aircraft using Community airports |
Responsible Committee | 1995/0359(SYN) | TRAN Transport and Tourism | Air carrier liability in case of air accidents |
Activities
Stats
Amendment Co-authors
Name | Group | Country | Ams |
---|
By types
Reports (4)By dossiers
Count | Dossier Reference | Title |
2 | 1997/0039(SYN) | Air transport safety: third countries aircraft using Community airports |
1 | 1998/0022(COD) | Air transport: protection of passenger rights, denied boarding compensation system |
1 | 1995/0359(SYN) | Air carrier liability in case of air accidents |
See historical changes of the Bio
Born
1951/03/05 - TetuanAntonio GONZÁLEZ TRIVIÑO on
History
(these mark the time of scraping, not the official date of the change)
2019-03-21Show (1) Changes | Timetravel
CV |
|
2014-09-07Show (1) Changes | Timetravel
CV/0 |
Trained as teacher of technical studies. Courses and seminars on economics and public administration.
|
2013-07-21Show (1) Changes
CV |
|