Spalato BELLERE'
Constituencies
Show earlier Constituencies...
- Alleanza nazionale Italy 1994/07/19 - 1998/04/21
Groups
Show earlier Groups...
- NA Member Non-attached 1994/07/19 - 1998/04/21
Committees
Show earlier committees...
Role | Committee | Start | End |
---|---|---|---|
Substitute of | Committee on Development and Cooperation | 1994/07/21 | 1996/06/05 |
Member of | Committee on Transport and Tourism | 1994/07/21 | 1997/01/15 |
Substitute of | Committee on the Environment, Public Health and Consumer Protection | 1996/04/25 | 1997/01/15 |
Substitute of | Committee on Development and Cooperation | 1997/01/16 | 1998/04/21 |
Substitute of | Committee on Petitions | 1997/01/16 | 1998/04/21 |
Member of | Committee on Transport and Tourism | 1997/01/16 | 1998/04/21 |
Delegations
Show earlier delegations...
Role | Delegation | Start | End |
---|---|---|---|
Member of | Delegation for relations with Central Asia and Mongolia | 1994/11/17 | 1995/07/11 |
Member of | Delegation for relations with Central Asia and Mongolia | 1995/07/12 | 1997/01/15 |
Member of | Delegation for relations with Kazakhstan, Kyrgyzstan, Uzbekistan, Tajikistan, Turkmenistan, and Mongolia | 1997/01/16 | 1997/10/13 |
Member of | Delegation for relations with Kazakhstan, Kyrgyzstan, Uzbekistan, Tajikistan, Turkmenistan, and Mongolia | 1997/10/14 | 1998/04/21 |
Rapporteur
Type | Dossier | Committee | Title |
---|---|---|---|
Committee Opinion | 1996/2161(COS) | TRAN Transport and Tourism | Tax-free sales: vendor control systems applied by the Member States |
Committee Opinion | 1996/2048(COS) | TRAN Transport and Tourism | Europe's maritime future: a contribution to the competitiveness of maritime industries |
Responsible Committee | 1996/0082(COD) | TRAN Transport and Tourism | Summer-time arrangements: 8th Directive |
Former Responsible Committee | 1996/0082(COD) | TRAN Transport and Tourism | Summer-time arrangements: 8th Directive |
Responsible Committee | 1995/0226(SYN) | TRAN Transport and Tourism | Roadworthiness tests for vehicles, speed limitation devices (consol. and amend. Directive 77/143/EEC) |
Former Responsible Committee | 1995/0226(SYN) | TRAN Transport and Tourism | Roadworthiness tests for vehicles, speed limitation devices (consol. and amend. Directive 77/143/EEC) |
Activities
Stats
Amendment Co-authors
Name | Group | Country | Ams |
---|
By types
Reports (4)By dossiers
Count | Dossier Reference | Title |
2 | 1996/0082(COD) | Summer-time arrangements: 8th Directive |
2 | 1995/0226(SYN) | Roadworthiness tests for vehicles, speed limitation devices (consol. and amend. Directive 77/143/EEC) |
See historical changes of the Bio
Born
1938/05/03 - NapoliSpalato BELLERE' on
History
(these mark the time of scraping, not the official date of the change)
2019-03-21Show (1) Changes | Timetravel
CV |
|
2014-09-07Show (4) Changes | Timetravel
CV/0 |
Graduate in medicine. Colonel in the reserve.
|
CV/1 |
Former chairman of the MSI-AN Group (Region of Campania). Member of the national leadership of the party.
|
CV/2 |
Former member of regional and town councils.
|
CV/3 |
Author of poetry in Neapolitan dialect (three publications). Author of scientific works. Knight of the Order of the Republic.
|
2014-07-07Show (1) Changes
CV |
|