Axel SCHÄFER
Constituencies
Show earlier Constituencies...
- Sozialdemokratische Partei Deutschlands Germany 1994/07/19 - 1999/07/19
Groups
Show earlier Groups...
- PSE Member Group of the Party of European Socialists 1994/07/19 - 1999/07/19
Committees
Show earlier committees...
Role | Committee | Start | End |
---|---|---|---|
Substitute of | Committee on Civil Liberties and Internal Affairs | 1994/07/21 | 1994/10/10 |
Member of | Committee on Institutional Affairs | 1994/07/21 | 1997/01/15 |
Substitute of | Committee on Social Affairs and Employment | 1994/07/21 | 1997/01/15 |
Substitute of | Committee on Employment and Social Affairs | 1997/01/16 | 1999/07/19 |
Member of | Committee on Institutional Affairs | 1997/01/16 | 1999/07/19 |
Delegations
Show earlier delegations...
Role | Delegation | Start | End |
---|---|---|---|
Member of | Delegation to the EU-Poland Joint Parliamentary Committee | 1994/11/17 | 1995/07/11 |
Member of | Delegation to the EU-Poland Joint Parliamentary Committee | 1995/07/12 | 1997/01/15 |
Member of | Delegation to the EU-Poland Joint Parliamentary Committee | 1997/01/16 | 1999/07/19 |
Rapporteur
Type | Dossier | Committee | Title |
---|---|---|---|
Committee Opinion | 1996/2131(INI) | INST Institutional Affairs | Union rights |
Activities
Stats
Amendment Co-authors
Name | Group | Country | Ams |
---|
By types
By dossiers
Count | Dossier Reference | Title |
See historical changes of the Bio
Born
1952/08/03 - Frankfurt am Main- Qualified administrator. Trade union posts (1970-1982).
Axel SCHÄFER on
History
(these mark the time of scraping, not the official date of the change)
2013-07-21Show (1) Changes
CV |
|