Theodorus J.J. BOUWMAN
Constituencies
Show earlier Constituencies...
- GroenLinks Netherlands 1999/07/20 - 2004/07/19
Groups
Show earlier Groups...
- Verts/ALE Member Group of the Greens/European Free Alliance 1999/07/20 - 2004/07/19
EP staff
Show earlier staff roles...
- Member of Conference of Committee Chairs 2002/01/21 - 2004/07/19
Committees
Show earlier committees...
Role | Committee | Start | End |
---|---|---|---|
Member of | Committee on Regional Policy, Transport and Tourism | 1999/07/21 | 2002/01/14 |
Substitute of | Committee on Employment and Social Affairs | 1999/07/22 | 2002/01/14 |
Member of | Committee on Employment and Social Affairs | 2002/01/17 | 2002/01/20 |
Substitute of | Committee on Regional Policy, Transport and Tourism | 2002/01/17 | 2004/07/19 |
Chair of | Committee on Employment and Social Affairs | 2002/01/21 | 2004/07/19 |
Delegations
Show earlier delegations...
Role | Delegation | Start | End |
---|---|---|---|
Member of | Delegation for relations with Japan | 1999/09/28 | 2002/01/14 |
Substitute of | Delegation to the EU-Romania Joint Parliamentary Committee | 1999/12/16 | 2002/01/14 |
Member of | Delegation for relations with Japan | 2002/02/07 | 2004/07/19 |
Substitute of | Delegation to the EU-Romania Joint Parliamentary Committee | 2002/02/07 | 2004/07/19 |
Rapporteur
Type | Dossier | Committee | Title |
---|---|---|---|
Responsible Committee | 2003/0047(COD) | EMPL Employment and Social Affairs | Labour force in the Community: sample survey on employment and unemployment |
Responsible Committee | 2001/0293(COD) | EMPL Employment and Social Affairs | Community statistics: income and living conditions in the Union EU-SILC |
Former Responsible Committee | 2001/0293(COD) | EMPL Employment and Social Affairs | Community statistics: income and living conditions in the Union EU-SILC |
Responsible Committee | 2001/0127(COD) | EMPL Employment and Social Affairs | Organisation of a labour force sample survey in the Community |
Responsible Committee | 2001/0006(COD) | EMPL Employment and Social Affairs | Protection of employees: insolvency of employer, transnational situations (amend. Directive 80/987/EEC) |
Former Responsible Committee | 2001/0006(COD) | EMPL Employment and Social Affairs | Protection of employees: insolvency of employer, transnational situations (amend. Directive 80/987/EEC) |
Responsible Committee | 1998/0249(COD) | DELE EP Delegation to Conciliation Committee | Port reception facilities for ship-generated waste and cargo residues |
Former Responsible Committee | 1998/0249(COD) | RETT Regional Policy, Transport and Tourism | Port reception facilities for ship-generated waste and cargo residues |
Activities
Stats
Amendment Co-authors
Name | Group | Country | Ams |
---|
By types
Plenary speeches (87)Reports (6)
By dossiers
Count | Dossier Reference | Title |
2 | 2001/0006(COD) | Protection of employees: insolvency of employer, transnational situations (amend. Directive 80/987/EEC) |
2 | 1998/0249(COD) | Port reception facilities for ship-generated waste and cargo residues |
1 | 2003/0047(COD) | Labour force in the Community: sample survey on employment and unemployment |
1 | 2001/0293(COD) | Community statistics: income and living conditions in the Union EU-SILC |
See historical changes of the Bio
Born
1947/07/20 - AmsterdamTheodorus J.J. BOUWMAN on
History
(these mark the time of scraping, not the official date of the change)
2019-03-21Show (1) Changes | Timetravel
CV |
|
2014-09-07Show (3) Changes | Timetravel
CV/0 |
Industrial engineer (1976). Lecturer in politics and economics (higher education) (Breda, 1973-1976). Researcher, SOBE (Electrotechnical Industry Research Foundation) (Eindhoven, 1973-1984). Lecturer in politics and economics / information technology (higher education) (Amsterdam, 1977-1988). Partner/consultant, STZ (Partnership and Control) (Amsterdam, 1985-1999).
|
CV/1 |
Member of the GroenLinks Eindhoven branch executive (1990-1992). Chairman of the GroenLinks group, Eindhoven Municipal Council (1994-1995).
|
CV/2 |
Chairman and member of the committee of the Toverfluit children's day care centre, Eindhoven. Member of the board of VJV (Educational Work for Young Adults), Eindhoven. Writer on current affairs.
|
2013-07-21Show (1) Changes
CV |
|