Potito SALATTO
Constituencies
Show earlier Constituencies...
- Popolari per l’Europa Italy 2014/01/27 - 2014/06/30
- Il Popolo della Libertà Italy 2009/07/14 - 2014/01/26
Groups
Show earlier Groups...
- PPE Member Group of the European People's Party (Christian Democrats) 2009/07/14 - 2014/06/30
Committees
Show earlier committees...
Role | Committee | Start | End |
---|---|---|---|
Member of | Committee on Constitutional Affairs | 2009/07/16 | 2011/10/23 |
Substitute of | Committee on Foreign Affairs | 2009/07/16 | 2012/01/18 |
Substitute of | Subcommittee on Security and Defence | 2009/07/16 | 2012/01/18 |
Member of | Committee on Budgets | 2011/10/24 | 2012/01/18 |
Member of | Committee on Budgets | 2012/01/19 | 2014/06/30 |
Substitute of | Committee on Foreign Affairs | 2012/01/19 | 2014/06/30 |
Substitute of | Subcommittee on Security and Defence | 2012/01/19 | 2014/06/30 |
Delegations
Show earlier delegations...
Role | Delegation | Start | End |
---|---|---|---|
Substitute of | Delegation for relations with Iran | 2009/09/16 | 2012/02/01 |
Member of | Delegation for relations with the Palestinian Legislative Council | 2009/09/16 | 2012/02/01 |
Member of | Delegation to the Parliamentary Assembly of the Union for the Mediterranean | 2009/09/16 | 2014/06/30 |
Member of | Delegation for relations with Iran | 2012/02/02 | 2012/04/24 |
Vice-Chair of | Delegation for relations with Iran | 2012/04/25 | 2014/06/30 |
Activities
Stats
Amendment Co-authors
Name | Group | Country | Ams |
---|---|---|---|
Giuseppe GARGANI | PPE | Italy | 24 |
Iva ZANICCHI | PPE | Italy | 24 |
Crescenzio RIVELLINI | PPE | Italy | 24 |
Raffaele BALDASSARRE | PPE | Italy | 7 |
Amalia SARTORI | PPE | Italy | 6 |
Mario MAURO | PPE | Italy | 2 |
Sergio BERLATO | PPE | Italy | 2 |
Roberta ANGELILLI | PPE | Italy | 1 |
Licia RONZULLI | PPE | Italy | 1 |
Marco SCURRIA | PPE | Italy | 1 |
Antonio CANCIAN | PPE | Italy | 1 |
Sergio Paolo Francesco SILVESTRIS | PPE | Italy | 1 |
Oreste ROSSI | EFD | Italy | 1 |
Carlo CASINI | PPE | Italy | 1 |
Adrian SEVERIN | S&D | Romania | 1 |
By types
Amendments (27)Plenary speeches (16)
By dossiers
Count | Dossier Reference | Title |
24 | 2011/2174(REG) | EP Rules of Procedure: code of conduct for Members in respect of financial interests and conflicts of interest (amend.) |
1 | 2011/2157(INI) | Review of the European neighbourhood policy |
1 | 2010/2291(ACI) | European Parliament/European Commission Agreement: transparency register for organisations and self-employed individuals engaged in EU policy-making and policy implementation |
1 | 2010/0074(COD) | Citizens' initiative |
1 | 2011/0458(COD) | Macro-financial assistance to Kyrgyzstan |
See historical changes of the Bio
Born
1942/01/22 - Bari- Secondary school-leaving certificate in classical subjects (1961).
- ENASARCO official (1973-1995); National Secretary of CISL-ENASARCO (1973-1975). Regional Vice-Secretary of the DC party (1993-1995).
- Member of Rome City Council (1976-1985). Member of Lazio Regional Council (1985-1995); Vice-President of the Lazio Regional Executive (1989-1990); councillor responsible for industry, trade, crafts and vocational training (1990-1993); councillor responsible for the regional budget (1992-1993); Vice-President of the Lazio Regional Council (1993-1994).
- Project coordinator for the UNDP (United Nations Development Programme), Kosovo (2000-2004); project coordinator for the UNDP, Albania (2004-2005).
- Substitute Vice-Chairman of the '11 September' non-profit association (2001-2009). Chair of ASSOFORUM 2007 (110 associations) (2007-2009).
- Vice-Chair of the Sky & Space Intergroup.
Potito SALATTO on
History
(these mark the time of scraping, not the official date of the change)
2012-01-21Show (1) Changes
CV |
|